|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 504, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2747.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3321.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1396.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 900.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 660.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|