California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB753 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill June 29, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023