|
09/24/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 543, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 5559.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6544.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2023
|
June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 1260.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1182.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 660.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|