California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB758 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill June 5, 2024
Bill May 23, 2024