Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 2829.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 3519.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2023
|
June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1183.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 572.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|