California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB777 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2023

Amended

Bill September 7, 2023
Bill September 1, 2023
Bill July 12, 2023
Bill July 3, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023