|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 505, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 2844.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 17. Page 3400.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 3124.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2023
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 3123.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 1385.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1183.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 711.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|