Senate
|
09/29/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5531.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6545.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
June 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
(Corrected June 6.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3053.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3012.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 2980.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 2957.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Set for hearing January 11 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
Set for hearing January 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|