California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB782 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill January 3, 2024
Bill March 21, 2023