|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 723, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2839.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 2769.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2683.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 3265.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2023
|
August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1257.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 854.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|