California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB816 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill July 12, 2023
Bill June 27, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023