|
09/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 288, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5603.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6501.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4018.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3819.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3445.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|