California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB900 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2024

Amended

Bill August 20, 2024
Bill August 8, 2024
Bill June 26, 2024
Bill June 5, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024