|
09/25/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 595, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6520.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 4074.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3964.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3753.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|