California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB941 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2024

Amended

Bill May 16, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024