|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 868, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5637.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 6716.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3965.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3446.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3379.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|