California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB957 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill August 19, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024