|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 450, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5511.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 6545.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4075.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3966.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3663.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3630.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Set for hearing April 17 in L. GOV. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|