California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB977 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2024

Amended

Bill June 13, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 23, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024