|
09/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 292, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5198.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6278.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3895.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3819.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|