California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB981 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2024

Amended

Bill August 5, 2024
Bill June 21, 2024
Bill May 2, 2024
Bill April 22, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024