|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 654, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5613.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6524.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4191.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3967.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3724.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3637.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on PUB S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|