California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB989 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill May 20, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024