06/20/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2024. | |||
06/20/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5860.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3871.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2024 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |