California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill June 14, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 20, 2024

Amended

Bill April 30, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024