08/13/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2024. | |||
08/13/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Senate | 08/05/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6202.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 1). | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4672.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |