04/21/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2023. | |||
04/21/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 701.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 936.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 21). | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 265.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |