California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR22 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 22 CHAPTER 31Relative to the Republic of Latvia. [ Filed with Secretary of State April 21, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 22, Newman. The Republic of Latvia.This measure would express the Legislatures support for the Governor to execute a cooperation agreement between the Republic of Latvia and the State of California that will promote mutual international trade and commerce.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, People throughout the State of California, the United States, and the Republic of Latvia commemorated the 100th anniversary of diplomatic relations throughout 2022, celebrating a relationship built on mutual commitments to freedom, democracy, security, prosperity, and the rule of law; and WHEREAS, While sharing a great deal in common, California and the Republic of Latvia are also sufficiently different, and over the past century, both entities have benefited immensely from efforts to increase trade, investment, and tourism, as well as cultural, educational, and scientific exchanges; andWHEREAS, Both California and the Republic of Latvia serve as commercial, tourism, entertainment, and shipping and logistical industry centers of their respective regions, positioning California as a gateway to the markets of the United States for Latvian commerce, and the Republic of Latvia as the gateway to the Baltic and northern European markets for Californian commerce; andWHEREAS, There have been numerous efforts to expand California and the Republic of Latvias bilateral relationship in the areas of health, climate change, environmental sustainability, information technology, and other areas of common interest and to facilitate the exchange of environmental protection, clean energy research, and development; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature expresses support for the Governor to execute a cooperation agreement between the Republic of Latvia and the State of California that will promote mutual international trade and commerce; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Governor and the Lieutenant Governor.
1+Enrolled April 17, 2023 Passed IN Senate April 13, 2023 Passed IN Assembly March 27, 2023 Amended IN Assembly March 22, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 22Introduced by Senator NewmanFebruary 08, 2023Relative to the Republic of Latvia. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 22, Newman. The Republic of Latvia.This measure would express the Legislatures support for the Governor to execute a cooperation agreement between the Republic of Latvia and the State of California that will promote mutual international trade and commerce.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, People throughout the State of California, the United States, and the Republic of Latvia commemorated the 100th anniversary of diplomatic relations throughout 2022, celebrating a relationship built on mutual commitments to freedom, democracy, security, prosperity, and the rule of law; and WHEREAS, While sharing a great deal in common, California and the Republic of Latvia are also sufficiently different, and over the past century, both entities have benefited immensely from efforts to increase trade, investment, and tourism, as well as cultural, educational, and scientific exchanges; andWHEREAS, Both California and the Republic of Latvia serve as commercial, tourism, entertainment, and shipping and logistical industry centers of their respective regions, positioning California as a gateway to the markets of the United States for Latvian commerce, and the Republic of Latvia as the gateway to the Baltic and northern European markets for Californian commerce; andWHEREAS, There have been numerous efforts to expand California and the Republic of Latvias bilateral relationship in the areas of health, climate change, environmental sustainability, information technology, and other areas of common interest and to facilitate the exchange of environmental protection, clean energy research, and development; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature expresses support for the Governor to execute a cooperation agreement between the Republic of Latvia and the State of California that will promote mutual international trade and commerce; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Governor and the Lieutenant Governor.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 22 CHAPTER 31Relative to the Republic of Latvia. [ Filed with Secretary of State April 21, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 22, Newman. The Republic of Latvia.This measure would express the Legislatures support for the Governor to execute a cooperation agreement between the Republic of Latvia and the State of California that will promote mutual international trade and commerce.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled April 17, 2023 Passed IN Senate April 13, 2023 Passed IN Assembly March 27, 2023 Amended IN Assembly March 22, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 22Introduced by Senator NewmanFebruary 08, 2023Relative to the Republic of Latvia. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 22, Newman. The Republic of Latvia.This measure would express the Legislatures support for the Governor to execute a cooperation agreement between the Republic of Latvia and the State of California that will promote mutual international trade and commerce.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
44
5- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 22 CHAPTER 31
5+ Enrolled April 17, 2023 Passed IN Senate April 13, 2023 Passed IN Assembly March 27, 2023 Amended IN Assembly March 22, 2023
66
7- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 22
7+Enrolled April 17, 2023
8+Passed IN Senate April 13, 2023
9+Passed IN Assembly March 27, 2023
10+Amended IN Assembly March 22, 2023
811
9- CHAPTER 31
12+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION
13+
14+ Senate Concurrent Resolution
15+
16+No. 22
17+
18+Introduced by Senator NewmanFebruary 08, 2023
19+
20+Introduced by Senator Newman
21+February 08, 2023
1022
1123 Relative to the Republic of Latvia.
12-
13- [ Filed with Secretary of State April 21, 2023. ]
1424
1525 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1626
1727 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1828
1929 SCR 22, Newman. The Republic of Latvia.
2030
2131 This measure would express the Legislatures support for the Governor to execute a cooperation agreement between the Republic of Latvia and the State of California that will promote mutual international trade and commerce.
2232
2333 This measure would express the Legislatures support for the Governor to execute a cooperation agreement between the Republic of Latvia and the State of California that will promote mutual international trade and commerce.
2434
2535 ## Digest Key
2636
2737 ## Bill Text
2838
2939 WHEREAS, People throughout the State of California, the United States, and the Republic of Latvia commemorated the 100th anniversary of diplomatic relations throughout 2022, celebrating a relationship built on mutual commitments to freedom, democracy, security, prosperity, and the rule of law; and
3040
3141 WHEREAS, While sharing a great deal in common, California and the Republic of Latvia are also sufficiently different, and over the past century, both entities have benefited immensely from efforts to increase trade, investment, and tourism, as well as cultural, educational, and scientific exchanges; and
3242
3343 WHEREAS, Both California and the Republic of Latvia serve as commercial, tourism, entertainment, and shipping and logistical industry centers of their respective regions, positioning California as a gateway to the markets of the United States for Latvian commerce, and the Republic of Latvia as the gateway to the Baltic and northern European markets for Californian commerce; and
3444
3545 WHEREAS, There have been numerous efforts to expand California and the Republic of Latvias bilateral relationship in the areas of health, climate change, environmental sustainability, information technology, and other areas of common interest and to facilitate the exchange of environmental protection, clean energy research, and development; now, therefore, be it
3646
3747 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature expresses support for the Governor to execute a cooperation agreement between the Republic of Latvia and the State of California that will promote mutual international trade and commerce; and be it further
3848
3949 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Governor and the Lieutenant Governor.