|
09/01/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2023
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2181.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2688.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2023
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 327.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|