California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR24 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2023

Chaptered

Bill August 31, 2023

Amended

Bill July 12, 2023
Bill July 10, 2023