05/26/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2023. | |||
05/26/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1601.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 920.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Ochoa Bogh. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Ochoa Bogh. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |