1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 27 CHAPTER 69 Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 26, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 27, Ochoa Bogh. California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.This measure would declare the week of April 9, 2023, to April 15, 2023, inclusive, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, When an emergency occurs, the prompt response of public safety personnel is critical to the protection of life and preservation of property; and WHEREAS, Thousands of dedicated public safety dispatchers serve the citizens of the State of California on a daily basis by answering emergency and nonemergency calls for assistance and coordinating public safety field units; and WHEREAS, These career professionals answer over 27,000,000 911 calls annually; and WHEREAS, These professionals measure their success in the lives that are saved by the 911 system each and every day; and WHEREAS, Public safety dispatchers have contributed substantially to the apprehension of criminals, suppression of fires, and helping of others during a critical time of need; and WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals work under challenging and stressful circumstances; and WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals dedicate their lives and careers to helping others; and WHEREAS, Effective January 1, 2021, Chapter 68 of the Statutes of 2020 recognized public safety dispatchers as first responders in the State of California; and WHEREAS, In 1991, the United States Congress designated the second week in April as National Public Safety Telecommunicators Week; and WHEREAS, California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week will recognize all public safety dispatchers who are an integral part of Californias first responder team, who work 24 hours per day, seven days per week, and serve as the first critical contact our citizens have with emergency services; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares the week of April 9, 2023, to April 15, 2023, inclusive, to be California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week, and honors and recognizes the importance and contributions of Californias public safety communications professionals and commends them for their continued commitment and service to the residents of California; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 23, 2023 Passed IN Senate April 27, 2023 Passed IN Assembly May 18, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 27Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthor: Senator Wahab)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wood, and Zbur)February 13, 2023 Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 27, Ochoa Bogh. California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.This measure would declare the week of April 9, 2023, to April 15, 2023, inclusive, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, When an emergency occurs, the prompt response of public safety personnel is critical to the protection of life and preservation of property; and WHEREAS, Thousands of dedicated public safety dispatchers serve the citizens of the State of California on a daily basis by answering emergency and nonemergency calls for assistance and coordinating public safety field units; and WHEREAS, These career professionals answer over 27,000,000 911 calls annually; and WHEREAS, These professionals measure their success in the lives that are saved by the 911 system each and every day; and WHEREAS, Public safety dispatchers have contributed substantially to the apprehension of criminals, suppression of fires, and helping of others during a critical time of need; and WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals work under challenging and stressful circumstances; and WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals dedicate their lives and careers to helping others; and WHEREAS, Effective January 1, 2021, Chapter 68 of the Statutes of 2020 recognized public safety dispatchers as first responders in the State of California; and WHEREAS, In 1991, the United States Congress designated the second week in April as National Public Safety Telecommunicators Week; and WHEREAS, California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week will recognize all public safety dispatchers who are an integral part of Californias first responder team, who work 24 hours per day, seven days per week, and serve as the first critical contact our citizens have with emergency services; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares the week of April 9, 2023, to April 15, 2023, inclusive, to be California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week, and honors and recognizes the importance and contributions of Californias public safety communications professionals and commends them for their continued commitment and service to the residents of California; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|