04/18/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2023. | |||
04/18/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Page 1005.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2023 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 458.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2022 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |