California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR6 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill March 16, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023
Bill February 2, 2023