02/15/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2024. | |||
02/15/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4042.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 5). | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3021.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |