1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 97 CHAPTER 4 Relative to National Human Trafficking Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State February 15, 2024. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 97, Grove. National Human Trafficking Awareness Month.This measure would recognize the month of January 2024 as National Human Trafficking Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, For more than two centuries, the United States has worked to advance the cause of freedom, serving as a beacon of hope for those who cherish liberty and opportunity and leading the fight for the dignity and inalienable rights of every person; andWHEREAS, Classified as a felony, human trafficking is a form of modern slavery. It is a crime that involves the use of force, fraud, or coercion to recruit, harbor, transport, provide, or obtain a person for the purpose of labor or sexual exploitation; andWHEREAS, In 2015, the United States Advisory Council on Human Trafficking was established by Congress and sits as the worlds preeminent human trafficking advisory body led by survivors of human trafficking and advises federal policy makers on antitrafficking policies; andWHEREAS, The International Labor Organization (ILO) estimated that there were 49,600,000 victims of human trafficking globally in 2021, of which 27,600,000 were in forced labor and 22,000,000 in forced marriage; andWHEREAS, According to the ILO, of the total number of global human trafficking victims, 4,900,000 are women and girls in forced commercial sexual exploitation; andWHEREAS, According to the United States Department of States 2022 Trafficking in Persons Report, human trafficking cases have been reported in all 50 states, the District of Columbia, and United States territories. The United States is among the top three countries of origin of human trafficking victims; andWHEREAS, In 2021, the National Human Trafficking Hotline stated that there were 1,334 cases of human trafficking documented in California, and in 2021 alone, federal law enforcement initiated more than 1,100 new investigations into human traffickers; andWHEREAS, The Legislature recognizes the continuously growing crime of human trafficking within California due to its ever-increasing population, extensive international border, large immigrant population, and primary airports and harbors; andWHEREAS, The State of California is committed to combating all forms of human trafficking, recovering victims, prosecuting offenders, advocating on behalf of victims, raising community awareness, and strengthening collaborative partnerships; andWHEREAS, National Slavery and Human Trafficking Prevention Month culminates in the annual observation of National Freedom Day on February 1, 2024; andWHEREAS, Founded on the principles of justice and fairness, the United States continues to lead the global movement to end modern slavery, with agencies and skilled professionals at the local, state, and national levels conducting investigations, collaborations, and trainings, organizing public outreach and promoting awareness, and directly assisting the victims of human trafficking; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the month of January 2024 as National Human Trafficking Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled February 12, 2024 Passed IN Senate January 22, 2024 Passed IN Assembly February 08, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 97Introduced by Senator Grove(Coauthors: Senators Alvarado-Gil, Archuleta, Ashby, Atkins, Becker, Blakespear, Caballero, Cortese, Dahle, Dodd, Eggman, Glazer, Hurtado, Jones, Limn, Menjivar, Newman, Nguyen, Niello, Ochoa Bogh, Portantino, Roth, Rubio, Seyarto, Wahab, Wiener, and Wilk)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Alanis, Alvarez, Bauer-Kahan, Chen, Megan Dahle, Davies, Essayli, Flora, Gallagher, Gipson, Grayson, Hoover, Lackey, Mathis, Stephanie Nguyen, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Luz Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Ta, Waldron, Wallis, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bains, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Cervantes, Connolly, Dixon, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Garcia, Haney, Hart, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Ramos, Reyes, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Schiavo, Soria, Ting, Valencia, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)January 10, 2024 Relative to National Human Trafficking Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 97, Grove. National Human Trafficking Awareness Month.This measure would recognize the month of January 2024 as National Human Trafficking Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, For more than two centuries, the United States has worked to advance the cause of freedom, serving as a beacon of hope for those who cherish liberty and opportunity and leading the fight for the dignity and inalienable rights of every person; andWHEREAS, Classified as a felony, human trafficking is a form of modern slavery. It is a crime that involves the use of force, fraud, or coercion to recruit, harbor, transport, provide, or obtain a person for the purpose of labor or sexual exploitation; andWHEREAS, In 2015, the United States Advisory Council on Human Trafficking was established by Congress and sits as the worlds preeminent human trafficking advisory body led by survivors of human trafficking and advises federal policy makers on antitrafficking policies; andWHEREAS, The International Labor Organization (ILO) estimated that there were 49,600,000 victims of human trafficking globally in 2021, of which 27,600,000 were in forced labor and 22,000,000 in forced marriage; andWHEREAS, According to the ILO, of the total number of global human trafficking victims, 4,900,000 are women and girls in forced commercial sexual exploitation; andWHEREAS, According to the United States Department of States 2022 Trafficking in Persons Report, human trafficking cases have been reported in all 50 states, the District of Columbia, and United States territories. The United States is among the top three countries of origin of human trafficking victims; andWHEREAS, In 2021, the National Human Trafficking Hotline stated that there were 1,334 cases of human trafficking documented in California, and in 2021 alone, federal law enforcement initiated more than 1,100 new investigations into human traffickers; andWHEREAS, The Legislature recognizes the continuously growing crime of human trafficking within California due to its ever-increasing population, extensive international border, large immigrant population, and primary airports and harbors; andWHEREAS, The State of California is committed to combating all forms of human trafficking, recovering victims, prosecuting offenders, advocating on behalf of victims, raising community awareness, and strengthening collaborative partnerships; andWHEREAS, National Slavery and Human Trafficking Prevention Month culminates in the annual observation of National Freedom Day on February 1, 2024; andWHEREAS, Founded on the principles of justice and fairness, the United States continues to lead the global movement to end modern slavery, with agencies and skilled professionals at the local, state, and national levels conducting investigations, collaborations, and trainings, organizing public outreach and promoting awareness, and directly assisting the victims of human trafficking; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the month of January 2024 as National Human Trafficking Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|