09/08/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 153, Statutes of 2023. | |||
09/08/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 09/01/2023 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 50. Noes 14. Page 2883.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 10). | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1072.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 794.) (April 19). | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |