California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 8, 2023

Amended

Bill March 30, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023