02/15/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2024. | |||
02/15/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 4040.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2024 | From inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Gipson. | ||
Assembly | 09/14/2023 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Bryan. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30). | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2023 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2023 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 1680.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1563.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Set for hearing June 14. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |