LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR88
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR88
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR88
Action History
Senate
05/02/2024
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3830.)
Senate
04/24/2024
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Senate
04/23/2024
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3724.) (April 23).
Senate
04/17/2024
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Senate
04/10/2024
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.