California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR88 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/03/2024

                            Enrolled  May 03, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  May 02, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 88Introduced by Senator GlazerApril 10, 2024 Relative to Native Americans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 88, Glazer. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Throughout our states history, Native Americans have played an important role in our culture and success; andWHEREAS, California is home to more people of Native American and Alaska Native heritage than any other state in the country. According to the 2020 United States Census, California represents 14 percent of the total Native American and Alaskan Native population; andWHEREAS, The state includes more federally recognized Indian tribes than any other state in the continental United States; and WHEREAS, The United States and the state recognize that these governments were the original custodians of the land and waters that now constitute California; andWHEREAS, These tribal governments continue to steward and protect the land and waters with their traditional ecological knowledge, especially related to fire practices; and WHEREAS, The cultural and governmental contributions of the native peoples of California have shaped the course of the state throughout history; and WHEREAS, Californias federally recognized tribal governments have made distinct and important contributions to the United States and the rest of the world in many fields, including agriculture, medicine, music, language, and art; and WHEREAS, Californias tribal nations and their citizens leaders seek to bridge racial, socioeconomic, and environmental barriers by empowering and educating people in order to protect Native American culture and heritage for future generations; and WHEREAS, On June 18, 2019, Governor Gavin Newsom recognized that the State of California historically sanctioned over a century of depredations and prejudicial policies against Californias tribal nations and their citizens; and WHEREAS, Governor Gavin Newsom commended and honored Californias tribal nations and their citizens for persisting, carrying on cultural and linguistic traditions, and stewarding and protecting this land that we now share; and apologized on behalf of the citizens of the State of California to all California Native Americans for the many instances of violence, maltreatment, and neglect California inflicted on tribes; and WHEREAS, We can never undo the wrongs inflicted on the people who have lived on this land that we now call California, but we can recognize their contributions while building bridges to heal deep wounds; and WHEREAS, Californias tribal governments and their citizens have given much to California and it is fitting that the honor is returned by recognizing their rich history and commitment to the State of California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate Rules Committee incorporate recognition of Native Americans in the order of business to acknowledge Native Americans as the original custodians of California and commend California Indian nations for their outstanding historical and present contributions to this great state; and be it furtherResolved, That the Senate of the State of California urges other public bodies in California to expand recognition for Californias tribal nations and their citizens during official government activities; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. 

 Enrolled  May 03, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  May 02, 2024 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 88Introduced by Senator GlazerApril 10, 2024 Relative to Native Americans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 88, Glazer. Digest Key

 Enrolled  May 03, 2024 Passed IN  Senate  May 02, 2024

Enrolled  May 03, 2024
Passed IN  Senate  May 02, 2024

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION

 Senate Resolution 

No. 88

Introduced by Senator GlazerApril 10, 2024

Introduced by Senator Glazer
April 10, 2024

 Relative to Native Americans. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 88, Glazer. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Throughout our states history, Native Americans have played an important role in our culture and success; and

WHEREAS, California is home to more people of Native American and Alaska Native heritage than any other state in the country. According to the 2020 United States Census, California represents 14 percent of the total Native American and Alaskan Native population; and

WHEREAS, The state includes more federally recognized Indian tribes than any other state in the continental United States; and 

WHEREAS, The United States and the state recognize that these governments were the original custodians of the land and waters that now constitute California; and

WHEREAS, These tribal governments continue to steward and protect the land and waters with their traditional ecological knowledge, especially related to fire practices; and 

WHEREAS, The cultural and governmental contributions of the native peoples of California have shaped the course of the state throughout history; and 

WHEREAS, Californias federally recognized tribal governments have made distinct and important contributions to the United States and the rest of the world in many fields, including agriculture, medicine, music, language, and art; and 

WHEREAS, Californias tribal nations and their citizens leaders seek to bridge racial, socioeconomic, and environmental barriers by empowering and educating people in order to protect Native American culture and heritage for future generations; and 

WHEREAS, On June 18, 2019, Governor Gavin Newsom recognized that the State of California historically sanctioned over a century of depredations and prejudicial policies against Californias tribal nations and their citizens; and 

WHEREAS, Governor Gavin Newsom commended and honored Californias tribal nations and their citizens for persisting, carrying on cultural and linguistic traditions, and stewarding and protecting this land that we now share; and apologized on behalf of the citizens of the State of California to all California Native Americans for the many instances of violence, maltreatment, and neglect California inflicted on tribes; and 

WHEREAS, We can never undo the wrongs inflicted on the people who have lived on this land that we now call California, but we can recognize their contributions while building bridges to heal deep wounds; and 

WHEREAS, Californias tribal governments and their citizens have given much to California and it is fitting that the honor is returned by recognizing their rich history and commitment to the State of California; now, therefore, be it 

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate Rules Committee incorporate recognition of Native Americans in the order of business to acknowledge Native Americans as the original custodians of California and commend California Indian nations for their outstanding historical and present contributions to this great state; and be it further

Resolved, That the Senate of the State of California urges other public bodies in California to expand recognition for Californias tribal nations and their citizens during official government activities; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.