Assembly | 04/24/2025 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2025 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2025 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 22). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2025 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2025 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2025 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2025 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2025 | Read first time. To print. |