Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Set for hearing March 19. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV., JUD., and APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |