03/25/2025 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2025. | |||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2025 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2025 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 774.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2025 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17). | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2025 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |