1 | | - | Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 20 CHAPTER 27 Relative to Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State March 25, 2025. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 20, Ochoa Bogh. Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Month.This measure would designate February 2025 as Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Peripartum cardiomyopathy (PPCM) is a form of heart failure that most often develops late in pregnancy but can occur up to five months into the postpartum period; andWHEREAS, According to the New England Journal of Medicine, the incidence of PPCM varies from 1 in 100 to 1 in 300 pregnancies in geographic hot spots, such as Nigeria and Haiti, to 1 in 1,000 to 1 in 4,000 in Europe and the United States; andWHEREAS, According to the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, general cardiomyopathy was the cause of 9 percent of pregnancy-related deaths between 2017 and 2019, inclusive; andWHEREAS, According to the American Heart Association, PPCM is diagnosed in mothers without a prior diagnosis of heart disease and when no other cause of heart failure can be found; andWHEREAS, PPCM can cause fatigue and low blood pressure due to restricted blood flow and swelling due to fluid buildup around vital organs; andWHEREAS, PPCM is difficult to diagnosis because symptoms mimic those of a healthy pregnancy, such as shortness of breath, increased urination at night, heart palpitations, swelling in the feet and legs, and lightheadedness; andWHEREAS, A weight gain of three pounds or more over a day or two may signal a fluid buildup that warrants a conversation with a medical professional; andWHEREAS, Several factors increase the risk of developing PPCM, including high blood pressure, preeclampsia, multiple gestations (e.g., twins), and advanced maternal age (e.g., 35 years of age or older); and WHEREAS, PPCM is more common amongst mothers of color and mothers diagnosed with PPCM in past pregnancies; andWHEREAS, According to the New England Journal of Medicine, some genetic mutationsincluding titin truncating variantsmay predispose some women to PPCM; and WHEREAS, According to the American Heart Association, PPCM is diagnosed when three criteria are met: 1) heart failure develops in late pregnancy or within months following delivery; 2) left ventricular ejection fraction (the percentage of fluid ejected from the left ventricle) is less than 45 percent (typically measured by an echocardiogram); and 3) no other cause for this heart failure can be found; andWHEREAS, Brain natriuretic peptide (BNP) and N-Terminal Pro-B-Type Natriuretic Peptide (NT-proBNP) levels may be tested to indicate to medical providers that the heart is not pumping properly; andWHEREAS, If caught early, many women with PPCM will recover normal heart function within six months after treatment starts; andWHEREAS, If left untreated, PPCM can lead to advanced, lifelong heart failure which could require a heart transplant or even result in death; andWHEREAS, PPCM treatment can include common medications that lower blood pressure, improve heart function, or reduce fluid retention, or a combination of the three, and diet changes such as restricting fluid and salt; andWHEREAS, Women can minimize their PPCM risk by not drinking or smoking, eating a well-balanced diet, exercising, and monitoring their blood pressure; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the month of February 2025 as Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled March 21, 2025 Passed IN Senate February 27, 2025 Passed IN Assembly March 20, 2025 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20252026 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 20Introduced by Senator Ochoa Bogh(Coauthors: Senators Alvarado-Gil, Archuleta, Ashby, Blakespear, Cabaldon, Caballero, Cervantes, Choi, Cortese, Dahle, Durazo, Gonzalez, Grayson, Grove, Jones, Laird, Limn, McGuire, McNerney, Menjivar, Niello, Prez, Richardson, Rubio, Seyarto, Stern, Valladares, Wahab, and Weber Pierson)February 10, 2025 Relative to Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 20, Ochoa Bogh. Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Month.This measure would designate February 2025 as Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Peripartum cardiomyopathy (PPCM) is a form of heart failure that most often develops late in pregnancy but can occur up to five months into the postpartum period; andWHEREAS, According to the New England Journal of Medicine, the incidence of PPCM varies from 1 in 100 to 1 in 300 pregnancies in geographic hot spots, such as Nigeria and Haiti, to 1 in 1,000 to 1 in 4,000 in Europe and the United States; andWHEREAS, According to the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, general cardiomyopathy was the cause of 9 percent of pregnancy-related deaths between 2017 and 2019, inclusive; andWHEREAS, According to the American Heart Association, PPCM is diagnosed in mothers without a prior diagnosis of heart disease and when no other cause of heart failure can be found; andWHEREAS, PPCM can cause fatigue and low blood pressure due to restricted blood flow and swelling due to fluid buildup around vital organs; andWHEREAS, PPCM is difficult to diagnosis because symptoms mimic those of a healthy pregnancy, such as shortness of breath, increased urination at night, heart palpitations, swelling in the feet and legs, and lightheadedness; andWHEREAS, A weight gain of three pounds or more over a day or two may signal a fluid buildup that warrants a conversation with a medical professional; andWHEREAS, Several factors increase the risk of developing PPCM, including high blood pressure, preeclampsia, multiple gestations (e.g., twins), and advanced maternal age (e.g., 35 years of age or older); and WHEREAS, PPCM is more common amongst mothers of color and mothers diagnosed with PPCM in past pregnancies; andWHEREAS, According to the New England Journal of Medicine, some genetic mutationsincluding titin truncating variantsmay predispose some women to PPCM; and WHEREAS, According to the American Heart Association, PPCM is diagnosed when three criteria are met: 1) heart failure develops in late pregnancy or within months following delivery; 2) left ventricular ejection fraction (the percentage of fluid ejected from the left ventricle) is less than 45 percent (typically measured by an echocardiogram); and 3) no other cause for this heart failure can be found; andWHEREAS, Brain natriuretic peptide (BNP) and N-Terminal Pro-B-Type Natriuretic Peptide (NT-proBNP) levels may be tested to indicate to medical providers that the heart is not pumping properly; andWHEREAS, If caught early, many women with PPCM will recover normal heart function within six months after treatment starts; andWHEREAS, If left untreated, PPCM can lead to advanced, lifelong heart failure which could require a heart transplant or even result in death; andWHEREAS, PPCM treatment can include common medications that lower blood pressure, improve heart function, or reduce fluid retention, or a combination of the three, and diet changes such as restricting fluid and salt; andWHEREAS, Women can minimize their PPCM risk by not drinking or smoking, eating a well-balanced diet, exercising, and monitoring their blood pressure; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the month of February 2025 as Peripartum Cardiomyopathy Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|