05/19/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
05/09/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |