04/13/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
04/08/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |