Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1028 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 6, 2022
Fiscal Note March 7, 2022
Fiscal Note January 17, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2022
Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 7, 2022

Amended

Bill March 21, 2022
Bill March 18, 2022