04/12/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
04/04/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/01/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/25/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | ||
House | 02/22/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |