|
05/17/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/10/2022 - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|